IL SB3636 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides limitations concerning lobbying by a member of the General Assembly or his or her spouse or any immediate family member living with that member of the General Assembly. Provides that no legislator may, during his or her term of office, negotiate for employment with a lobbying entity. Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides a revolving door prohibition on former members of the General Assembly lobbying the General Assembly within a specified period of time. Amends the Election Code. Provides for candidate political committee restrictions and makes related requirements. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Expands the definition of "predicate activity" to include bribery, official misconduct, solicitation misconduct (State government), solicitation misconduct (local government), and legislative misconduct. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Expands the authority of the State's Attorney to seek a court order authorizing the interception of a private communication under specified circumstances concerning activity under the Illinois Street Gang and Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Law. Amends the Statewide Grand Jury Act. Expands the authority of a Statewide Grand Jury to investigate and indict offenses involving the corruption of a public official, to include theft, fraud, extortion, or a violation of the Official Misconduct and Public Contracts Article of the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that venue for purposes of trial for any offense involving the corruption of a public official may be in any county in which any portion of the offense occurred. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
GOVERNMENT-ETHICS REQ
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 9-3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 9-8.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 11.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 2-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 2-115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 33G-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 215 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 215 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 215 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 108B-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3636&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB3636.htm |