IL SB3630 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1415
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1415
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that an "eligible veteran or serviceperson" includes a veteran or serviceperson who (i) was an Illinois resident within 6 months after entering the service or (ii) became an Illinois resident within 6 months after leaving the service and can establish at least 30 years of continuous residency in the State of Illinois. Effective July 1, 2010.
Title
SCH CD-MIA-POW SCHOLARSHIPS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-30 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1415 | |
2010-07-30 | Effective Date July 30, 2010 | |
2010-07-30 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-04 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-001-000 | |
2010-05-04 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Higher Education; 008-000-000 | |
2010-05-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Higher Education | |
2010-04-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 28, 2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-04-23 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-22 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 020-000-000 | |
2010-04-21 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-04-21 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-17 | First Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2010-03-15 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 034-007-000 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass Higher Education; 006-003-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Higher Education | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |