IL SB3625 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Design-Build Procurement Act. Extends the repeal of the Act from July 1, 2022 to July 1, 2027. Effective immediately.
Title
DESIGN BUILD PROC-EXT SUNSET
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1016 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2022-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-02-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-016-000 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 537 | 90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |