IL SB3619 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, upon knowledge of an incident of sexual assault committed on school grounds or at a school-sponsored activity or event by a student against a teacher, a teacher against a student, or a student against another student, a school district shall report the incident to the State Board of Education; defines "sexual assault". Provides that the State Board shall post on its Internet website for each school year the total number of reported incidents statewide and in each school district. Provides that the State Board shall also report the data annually to the General Assembly no later than September 1 of each year.
Title
SCH CD-SEXUAL ASSAULT-REPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-29 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-06-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.173 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3619&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3619.htm |