IL SB3616 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1342
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1342
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code and Clerks of the Court Act. Increases the amount of an administrative sanction imposed in addition to other penalties and liabilities upon a person who is found guilty of or pleads guilty to violating the DUI provision of the Illinois Vehicle Code from $500 to $750. Makes corresponding changes in the Clerks of the Court Act. Makes technical changes in provisions concerning disbursement of money collected by circuit clerks of the court. Effective January 1, 2011.
Title
VEH CD-DUI ADMIN SANCTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-27 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1342 | |
2010-07-27 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-27 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-03 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-03 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-20 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-15 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 006-000-000 | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-24 | First Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2010-03-18 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-17 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cronin | |
2010-03-17 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2010-03-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Cronin | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 11, 2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 006-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2010-02-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Cronin |