IL SB3609 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1086
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1086
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act and the School Code. Provides that the State Board of Education, in consultation with the State Comptroller, may transfer line item appropriations for General State Aid between the Common School Fund and the Education Assistance Fund (instead of from the Common School Fund to the Education Assistance Fund). Removes the requirement that the salaries for regional superintendents and assistant regional superintendents of schools be payable from the Common School Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-COMMON SCH FND-TRANSFER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-16 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1086 | |
2010-07-16 | Effective Date July 16, 2010 | |
2010-07-16 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-23 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-23 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-20 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2010-04-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 018-000-000 | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-17 | First Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2010-03-15 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Education | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio |