IL SB3602 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Forestry Development Act. Provides that in order to be eligible to submit a forest management plan to participate in the cost share program, a timber grower must own or operate at least 5 contiguous acres (instead of 10 contiguous acres) of land in this State on which timber is produced. Makes a corresponding change.
Title
FOREST DEVELOPMENT COST SHARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Appropriations- Agriculture, Environment, and Energy |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
525 | 15 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3602&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB3602.htm |