IL SB3597 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Director of Corrections to deliver a quitclaim deed for certain real property in Kankakee County to the Village of Hopkins Park for $1, subject to specified conditions. Effective immediately.
Title
CORRECTIONS-LAND DATABASE
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Jackie Haas [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1015 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-04-05 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - April 4, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2022-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2022-03-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2022-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000 |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-02-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-02-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Joyce |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |