IL SB3590 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Veterinary Medicine and Surgery Practice Act of 2004. Provides that it is grounds for discipline if any person with a license or certification under the Act charges in excess of $250 without an express prior authorization for services performed on an animal. Effective immediately.
Title
VET MED-AUTHORIZATION SERVICES
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Bomke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Larry K. Bomke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 115 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3590&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3590.htm |