IL SB3569 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that, if a deviation from the requirements for petitions under this Code is minor or technical in nature and does not defeat the thrust, purpose, and effect of the Code or affect the intent to guarantee a fair and honest election, the defect in the petitions shall not render the petition invalid.
Title
ELEC CD-PETITION VALIDITY
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Biss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3569&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3569.htm |