IL SB3551 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Enhances the penalties for certain violations of the statutes concerning unlawful use or possession of weapons by felons, aggravated unlawful use of a weapon, unlawful possession of a firearm by a street gang member, vehicular hijacking, and aggravated vehicular hijacking. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a prisoner serving a sentence for unlawful use or possession of a weapon by felons or unlawful possession of a firearm by a street gang member shall receive no more than 4.5 days of sentence credit for each month of his or her sentence of imprisonment. Provides that a prisoner serving a sentence for aggravated unlawful use of a weapon, except for a first offense or a first offense in which the offender is at least 18 years of age and illegally carries or possesses a firearm without being issued a currently valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card, shall receive no more than 4.5 days of sentence credit for each month of his or her sentence of imprisonment. Provides that a person convicted of unlawful use or possession of weapons by felons, or persons in the custody of the Department of Corrections facilities, aggravated unlawful use of a weapon by a person who has been previously convicted of a felony in this State or another jurisdiction, or unlawful possession of a firearm by a street gang member is ineligible for the county impact incarceration program.
Title
FIREARM&VEH&AGG VEH HIJACKING
Sponsors
Sen. John Curran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 18-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 18-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3551&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3551.htm |