IL SB3551 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probate Act of 1975. In provisions concerning inheritance from or through a natural parent and for determining the property rights of any person under any instrument, provides that an adopted child is not a child of a natural parent whose parental rights were terminated by the adoption (rather than that an adopted child is not a child of a natural parent), nor is the child a descendant of a natural parent or of any lineal or collateral kindred of a natural parent, unless specified conditions apply.
Title
PROBATE-ADOPTED CHILDREN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 2-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3551&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3551.htm |