IL SB3538 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits criminal trespass to State supported land when he or she enters upon land owned, leased, or otherwise used by a public body or district organized under the Metropolitan Transit Authority Act, the Local Mass Transit District Act, or the Regional Transportation Authority Act, after receiving, prior to the entry, notice from the public body or district, or its representative, that the entry is forbidden, or remains upon the land or in the building after receiving notice from the public body or district, or its representative, to depart and, in doing so, causes a delay in transit service lasting more than 15 minutes or compromising public safety. Provides that a first violation is a Class 4 felony and a second or subsequent violation is a Class 3 felony.
Title
CRIM CD-TRESPASS-STATE SUPPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1125 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2014-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-16 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-11 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2014-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sandoval |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 3, 2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-03-20 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 21-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |