IL SB3511 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Let America Read Act. Provides that an entity or an entity's staff with oversight over the books, instructional materials, or curriculum used in a public school may not refuse to approve or prohibit the use of books, instructional materials, or a curriculum, including, but not limited to, memoirs, autobiographies, and biographies, based upon the depiction of matters of race, ethnicity, sexual orientation, sexual and reproductive health, gender identity, religion, or human rights activism. Provides that these provisions do not restrict an entity with oversight over the books, instructional materials, or curriculum used in a public school from imposing limitations on the access to books, instructional materials, or a curriculum based upon the age and developmental level of the students who will have access. Amends the School Code to set forth a penalty for a school district that violates the Act.
Title
SCHOOL-INSTRUCTIONAL MATERIALS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3511&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3511.htm |