IL SB3506 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Energy & Environment Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 4:00 pm in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Energy & Environment Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 4:00 pm in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Deletes a provision that requires a Clean Air Act Permit Program (CAAPP) permit to contain a provision which creates an emergency-related affirmative defense if certain requirements are met.
Title
IEPA-AFFIRMATIVE DEF REMOVAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 015-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 39.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |