IL SB3505 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a 3-axle truck mixer registered as a Special Hauling Vehicle, used exclusively for the mixing and transportation of concrete in the plastic state, may, when laden, transmit upon the road surface, except when on part of the National System of Interstate and Defense Highways, the following maximum weights: 22,000 pounds on a single axle; 40,000 pounds on a tandem axle; 40,000 pounds gross weight on a 2-axle vehicle; and 54,000 pounds gross weight on a 3-axle vehicle. Provides that a 3-axle truck mixer registered as a Special Hauling Vehicle, used exclusively for the mixing and transportation of concrete in the plastic state, is not subject to the bridge formula. Removes provisions limiting to vehicles manufactured before or in the model year of 2014 and first registered in Illinois before January 1, 2015 the applicability of weight limit exceptions for certain 4-axle special hauling vehicles.
Title
VEH CD-3-AXLE MIXERS:WEIGHT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2012-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2012-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles W. Krezwick |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; J. Jones |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 009-000-000 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John O. Jones |
2012-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John O. Jones |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John O. Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 15-111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |