IL SB3471 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
Pending: House Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
Pending: House Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows the Secretary of State to issue a new set of license plates to an owner of a vehicle whose plates were stolen. Provides that the new set of plates shall be issued without a fee. Requires the Secretary to assign a new number plate or plates in lieu of a duplicate of the plate or plates that were stolen. Make changes to the registration fee for lost or destroyed plates.
Title
VEH CD-LOST OR STOLEN PLATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-820 | Amended Code | Citation Text |