IL SB3467 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1084
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1084
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Removes the word electric from the definition of "lessor." To the definition of "park district", adds forest preserve districts, conservation districts, and other local public entities that have recreation departments or facilities and have leases with lessors. Provides that waivers of subrogation are against public policy.
Title
PARK DIST/PUB UTIL LIABILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1084 |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Effective Date June 10, 2022 |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 4, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2022-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000 |
2022-03-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-02-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-009-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 006-001-000 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |