IL SB3464 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cook County Forest Preserve District Act. Provides that all general taxes levied by the board of any forest preserve district shall be levied by general categories annually (currently, by March 28 annually) for all fiscal years in the same manner as taxes are levied for city and village purposes. Effective immediately.
Title
COOK CO FOREST PRESERVE-LEVY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 810 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |