IL SB3464 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0945
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0945
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code and Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a county's or municipality's initial report of its audit findings to CATV operators shall include the complete list of all addresses within the corporate limits of the county or municipality. Limits the scope of provisions concerning franchise fees and service provider fee reviews. Provides that contingent fees paid to auditors, including subcontractors, may not exceed 25% of the net amount recovered, inclusive of interest and penalties. Provides that counties and municipalities shall provide to each CATV operator an updated complete list of addresses within the corporate limits of the county or municipality annually. In addition, the county or municipality shall provide a CATV operator the updated address list within 90 days after the date of a written request by the CATV operator and before a CATV operator's franchise fees or service provider fees are derived. Holds harmless the CATV operator for any franchise fee underpayment if the county or municipality does not provide the updated address list. Makes other changes.
Title
COUNTIES/MUNI-CATV FEE AUDITS
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] |
Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0945 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date August 17, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Telecommunications and Information Technology; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1095.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-42-11.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |