IL SB3455 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In the provision defining "eligible employment" for the purpose of allowing a teacher to return to teaching in subject shortage areas without impairing his or her retirement status or retirement annuity, changes the ending date of the employment from no later than June 30, 2013 to no later than June 30, 2018.
Title
PENS CD-TRS-RETURN TO TEACHING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 16-150.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3455&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3455.htm |