IL SB3451 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
Pending: House Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
Pending: House Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Transportation Cooperation Act of 1971, the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Bi-State Development Agency Act, and the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that a railroad passenger service, a Transportation Service Association, the Department of Transportation, the Regional Transportation Authority, the Chicago Transit Authority, and the Commuter Rail Division of the Regional Transportation Authority shall issue an annual report on or before December 31 of each year containing all rail safety recommendations made by the National Transportation Safety Board during the previous 12 months and the status of the entity's implementation of those recommendations. Provides that the Federal Railroad Corporation (also known as Amtrak) and the Bi-State Development Agency may issue a similar report. Provides that a report issued under the provisions shall be made publicly available on the website of the entity. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
RAIL SAFETY RECOMMENDATIONS
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Simmons [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] | Sen. Donald DeWitte [R] | Rep. Matt Hanson [D] |
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] | Rep. Eva Dina Delgado [D] | Rep. Dave Vella [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-423 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 105 | 8.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 225 | 7.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3615 | 5.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |