IL SB3449 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administration Code of Illinois. Provides that certain amounts shall be transferred from the General Revenue Fund to the Common School Fund. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the income tax rates on individuals, trusts, estates, and corporations shall be 5%. Increases the residential real property tax credit from to 10%. Increases the limitation on the education expense credit. Increases the percentage of the earned income tax credit. Makes changes concerning distributions to the Local Government Distributive Fund. Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that certain services are taxable under the Act. Amends the School Code. Creates the Education Financial Award System Fund, the Digital Learning Technology Grant Fund, and the STEM Education Center Grant Fund. Makes changes concerning the Early Childhood Education Block Grant; financial awards for school improvement and other awards; academic early warning and watch status; an educational improvement plan; the creation of the Digital Learning Technology Grant Program, a best practices clearinghouse, the Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Education Center Grant Program, and a resource management service; audits; school board member leadership training; a school district's school report card; financial policies and plans; a capital improvement plan; protection from suit; financial accountability; non-referendum bonds; the foundation level of support under the State aid formula; the New Teacher Induction and Mentoring Program; school board associations; and transportation reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-EDUCATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-16.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 10-17a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-17b | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 10-17c | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 10-17d | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 10-20.56 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 10-22.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 17-2.11d | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 18-8.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1C-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.160 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.161 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.162 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.163 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.164 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.25c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.25d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.25d-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 21A-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21A-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21A-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21A-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21A-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 21A-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 23-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 23-5.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 23-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 29-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 3-6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 3-6.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 3-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 20 | 38.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 20 | 50-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.855 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.856 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.857 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.858 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 120 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 202.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3449&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3449.htm |