IL SB3449 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that appropriations for the acquisition of motor vehicles for the State vehicle fleet are payable from the State Garage Revolving Fund. Provides that all fees and other money received by the Department of Central Management Services incident to the operation of the State vehicle fleet shall be paid into the State Garage Revolving Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-STATE VEHICLE FLEET
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6c.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 8.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3449&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3449.htm |