IL SB3429 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Administration of Antibiotics to Food-Producing Animals Act. Provides that a medically important antibiotic may be administered to a food-producing animal only if prescribed by a veterinarian licensed under the Veterinary Medicine and Surgery Practice Act of 2004 who has visited the farm operation within the previous 6 months and only if deemed necessary for specified purposes. Provides that a producer may provide a medically important antibiotic to a food-producing animal only for the period necessary to accomplish the specified purposes. Provides that in that case, antibiotics should be used on the smallest number of animals and for the shortest time possible. Provides that the use of medically important antibiotics shall not exceed a duration of 21 days. Provides that a producer shall keep a record of the specific beginning and ending dates for the provision of an antibiotic. Provides that provisions concerning the administration of antibiotics to food-producing animals take effect on January 1, 2020. Requires a producer that operates a large concentrated animal feeding operation, as defined by the United States Environmental Protection Agency, to file an annual report containing specified information in a form and manner required by the Department of Public Health by rule. Provides that the Department may take the actions necessary to prepare to implement the provisions of the Act in advance of the effective date of the other provisions of the Act. Provides that the Attorney General has the exclusive authority to enforce the Act, shall issue a civil penalty of $1,000 for a violation of the Act, and may seek an injunction to prevent a violation of the Act.
Title
IDPH-ANTIBIOTICS-ANIMALS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3429&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3429.htm |