IL SB3402 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cannabis Control Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Statutes of Limitation |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 550 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |