IL SB3397 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that a retailer is relieved from liability for any tax that becomes due and payable if the tax is represented by amounts that are found to be worthless or uncollectible and have been charged off in accordance with generally accepted accounting principles on and after July 1, 2014. Provide for a deduction if the retailer had previously paid such a tax. Effective immediately.
Title
ROTA-BAD DEBT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2014-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - December 2, 2014 |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-11-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2014-11-20 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-11-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-11-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-11-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-11-06 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-10-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2014-10-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2014-05-30 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2014-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-15 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2014-05-01 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-16 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2014-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2014; |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 010-002-000 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |