IL SB3397 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0691
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0691
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. In a Section concerning the applicability of the Code to public institutions of higher education, includes the Illinois Mathematics and Science Academy in the definition of "public institution of higher education". Effective immediately.
Title
PROCUREMENT-HIGHER ED
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0691 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2012 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2012-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2012-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2012-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2012-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-05-30 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2012-05-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2012-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2012-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2012-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2012-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Lauzen |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2012-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2012-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2012-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2012-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2012-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2012-05-24 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2012-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-05-21 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2012-05-21 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-05-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2012-05-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2012 |
2012-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2012-03-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2012-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2012-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2012-03-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-002 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 008-000-000 |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 1-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |