IL SB3394 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0892
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0892
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community Association Manager Licensing and Disciplinary Act, the Home Inspector License Act, and the Real Estate License Act of 2000. Reduces the minimum age requirement for licensure as a community association manager, supervising community association manager, home inspector, broker, or managing broker to 18 years of age (rather than 21 years of age). Makes a conforming change. Effective immediately.
Title
PROF LICENSING-VARIOUS-MIN AGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0892 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date August 14, 2018 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-001-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 427 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 427 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 441 | 5-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 5-27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 5-28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |