IL SB3391 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Non-Recourse Consumer Lawsuit Funding Act. Provides that all contracts for non-recourse consumer lawsuit funding shall be written, provide the total funding amount to the customer, itemize one-time fees, allow the customer to cancel the contract within 10 business days following receipt of the funding amount without penalty or further obligation, and meet other specified criteria. Provides that any attorney's fee or medical lien takes priority over any lien of the non-recourse consumer lawsuit funding company. Contains a provision concerning standards and practices of non-recourse consumer lawsuit funding companies. Provides criteria for non-recourse consumer lawsuit funding companies to receive and retain licenses, the closing of its business or surrendering of the license, and prohibited acts. Contains provisions for enforcement, rulemaking, bonding, and judicial review. Provides that the total amount of financing provided by a non-recourse consumer lawsuit funding company per consumer per legal claim shall not exceed $40,000. Provides that under no circumstances shall the total amount of charges, interest, fees, or any other charges, when taken together, exceed 80% of the proceeds from the legal claim. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to provide for the repeal of the Non-Recourse Consumer Lawsuit Funding Act on May 31, 2015. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act to provide that a person who knowingly violates the Non-Recourse Consumer Lawsuit Funding Act commits an unlawful practice. Amends the Consumer Installment Loan Act. Provides that no licensee shall engage in the business of providing non-recourse consumer lawsuit funding, except in compliance with that Act. Effective immediately.
Title
CONSUMER LAWSUIT FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 670 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 505 | 2Z | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3391&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3391.htm |