IL SB3378 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Public Health Committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Public Health Committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Repeals a requirement for the Department of Public Health to provide to school districts educational materials on meningococcal disease and meningococcal vaccines. Amends the School Code to make conforming changes.
Title
IDPH-MENINGITIS EDUCATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Public Health Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-003-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2310 | 2310-391 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2310 | 2310-700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |