IL SB3371 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975 and the Riverboat Gambling Act to authorize slot machine gambling at race tracks (and makes conforming changes in various Acts). Effective immediately.
Title
HORSE RACING-SLOTS AT TRACKS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-05 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Postponed - Gaming | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Gaming | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Gaming | |
2010-02-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3371&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3371.htm |