IL SB3340 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID ACT-REPEAL
Sponsors
Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Christine Johnson [R] | Sen. Kyle McCarter [R] | Sen. Gary Forby [D] |
Sen. John Sullivan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | To Public Health Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine J. Johnson |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3340&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3340.htm |