IL SB3337 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Family Support Demonstration Project Act. Repeals a provision requiring the Department of Children and Family Services to monitor and evaluate a 2-year family support center demonstration project and to submit a status report to the General Assembly on February 1, 1994 and 1995, and a final report on February 1, 1996. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-FAM SUPPORT PROJECT-RPT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1024 |
2012-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date August 17, 2012 |
2012-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2012-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2012-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2012-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2012-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2012 |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 29, 2012 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 30 | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |