IL SB3319 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Provides that a student who is already licensed to teach and is enrolled in a course of study leading to an additional teaching endorsement or a master's degree in an academic field in which he or she is teaching or plans to teach may participate in the Minority Teachers of Illinois scholarship program (rather than limiting the program to undergraduate students). Makes a conforming change. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-MINORITY TEACHERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-10 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-10SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-01-10SenateSenate Concurs
2017-01-10SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-01-10SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-01-10SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-01-10Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-01-10SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-10SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-10SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-10SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-01-10SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-01-10SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-01-10SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-01-10SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-01-10SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-01-10SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-01-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-01-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-01-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-01-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-01-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-01-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-01-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - January 10, 2017
2017-01-09SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
2017-01-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-009-001
2017-01-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-01-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-01-09HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-01-09HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Peter Breen
2017-01-09HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Peter Breen
2017-01-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000
2017-01-09HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-01-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-01-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-01-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-01-09HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2016-06-30HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
2016-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2016-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
2016-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2016-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2016-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2016-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-05-27HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
2016-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-18HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 009-006-000
2016-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
2016-05-13HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
2016-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2016-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-05-11HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2016-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2016-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2016-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-04-21HouseArrived in House
2016-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2016-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2016-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2016
2016-04-14SenateSecond Reading
2016-04-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2016-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
2016-04-06SenateDo Pass Education; 012-000-000
2016-03-16SenatePostponed - Education
2016-03-08SenateAssigned to Education
2016-02-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2016-02-19SenateFirst Reading
2016-02-19SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11094750Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3319&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3319.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3319eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3319enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3319ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3319ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3319ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB3319_04212016_120000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900SB3319_01092017_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB3319_01102017_005002C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB3319_01102017_005001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB3319_01102017_005000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback