IL SB3300 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Developmental Disability and Mental Disability Services Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall: (1) oversee the transition of adult persons with developmental disabilities in the State who qualify for Medicaid Waiver services, who reside in intermediate care facilities for persons with developmental disabilities with 9 or more residents, and who affirmatively request to receive community-based services or placement in a community-based setting; and (2) oversee the transition of adult persons with developmental disabilities in the State who qualify for Medicaid Waiver services, who reside in a family home, who are in need of community-based services or placement in a community-based setting, and who affirmatively request community-based services or placement in a community-based setting. Effective immediately.
Title
DDMDSA-DEV DISABLED-COMMUNITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 80 | 12-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
405 | 80 | 12-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
405 | 80 | Art. XII heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3300&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3300.htm |