IL SB3298 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Requires approval by the local law enforcement agency where the applicant for a concealed carry license resides before the Department of State Police can issue the license. Provides the chief law enforcement officer of the law enforcement agency or sheriff, depending on the residence of the applicant, has 30 days from receipt of the application to review the application and he or she shall approve the applicant unless he or she determines the applicant is unsuitable for a concealed carry license. Provides a finding of unsuitability requires: (1) reliable and credible information that the applicant has exhibited or engaged in behavior that suggests that, if issued a license, the applicant may create a risk to public safety; (2) existing factors that suggest that, if issued a license, the applicant may create a risk to public safety; (3) reasonable suspicion that the applicant is a danger to himself or herself or others; or (4) other reasonable cause exists for denial. Provides if the chief law enforcement officer or sheriff fails to notify the Department of his or her approval or denial of the application within 30 days of receipt of application, the Department of State Police shall consider the application approved and completed, and shall process the application in accordance with the Act. Provides an applicant denied approval by a local law enforcement agency may petition the circuit court in writing in the county of his or her residence for a hearing upon the denial.
Title
CONCEAL CARRY-POLICE APPROVAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
430 | 66 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 87 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3298&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3298.htm |