IL SB3282 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1337
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1337
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. In a provision authorizing local authorities to enact an ordinance or resolution prohibiting the use of or restricting the maximum weight of vehicles upon any highway under their jurisdiction, for a total period of not to exceed 90 days in any one calendar year, whenever any the highway by reason of deterioration, rain, snow, or other climate conditions will be seriously damaged or destroyed, provides for an exception for cargo tank vehicles with 2 or 3 permanent axles when delivering propane for heating, if the cargo tank is loaded at no more than 50 percent capacity, and the gross vehicle weight of the vehicle does not exceed 32,000 pounds. Provides that the cargo tank vehicle must have an operating gauge on the cargo tank which indicates the amount of propane as a percent of capacity of the cargo tank and must have the capacity displayed on the cargo tank or documentation of the capacity of the cargo tank in the vehicle.
Title
VEH CD-PROPANE CARGO TANK VEH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-03 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-27 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1337 | |
2010-07-27 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-27 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-03 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 048-000-000 | |
2010-05-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 006-000-000 | |
2010-05-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government | |
2010-04-27 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-27 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dale E. Risinger | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 28, 2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-04-23 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-002-000 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-22 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-20 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000 | |
2010-04-20 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-04-20 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee | |
2010-03-19 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading | |
2010-03-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-19 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons | |
2010-03-18 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Risinger | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Risinger | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-000-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-000-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale E. Risinger | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale E. Risinger | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale E. Risinger |