IL SB3281 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Comptroller Act. Requires that State agencies under the Governor's jurisdiction annually report to the Comptroller their programs and program expansions created by State statute that have been unfunded for the previous 3 fiscal years. Requires the Comptroller annually to file a compilation of that information with the Governor and General Assembly.
Title
COMPTROLLER-UNFUNDED PROGRAMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-07 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-04-29 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2010-04-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 015-000-000 | |
2010-04-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2010-03-12 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy | |
2010-03-11 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2010-03-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. J. Bradley Burzynski |