IL SB3276 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0965
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0965
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Permits the State Treasurer to retain an administrative charge for the costs of services associated with the deposit of moneys that are remitted directly to the State Treasurer. Provides that the amount of the administrative charge may be determined by the State Treasurer and shall not exceed 2% of the amount deposited. Provides that this charge shall apply to fines, fees, or other amounts remitted directly to the State Treasurer by circuit clerks, county clerks, and other entities that are not State agencies for deposit into a fund in the State treasury. Provides that the charge shall apply to any form of fines, fees, or other collections created on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Sets forth provisions governing the State Treasurer's Administrative Fund. Amends the State Finance Act and creates the State Treasurer's Administrative Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
TREASURER-ADMIN CHARGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0965 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Effective Date August 15, 2014 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-028-000 |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 014-001-000 |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2014-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 010-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 011-000-000 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 505 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.855 | New Code | See Bill Text |