IL SB3263 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Police Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of the bill, the Director of State Police shall not appoint auxiliary State policemen. Repeals provisions concerning auxiliary State policemen to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE POLICE-AUXILIARY POLICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sims
2018-04-18SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20261023Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback