IL SB3261 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Vehicle Theft Reporting Act. Provides that for each day after the discovery that a motor vehicle in possession of a motor vehicle repair station has been stolen, and a report has not been made to a police department or sheriff's department, shall be a separate violation.
Title
VEH THEFT REPORTING-VIOLATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 10 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3261&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3261.htm |