IL SB3241 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Natural Resources Act. Makes changes concerning the powers and duties of the Illinois State Museum. Repeals a provision which specifies that the Board of the Illinois State Museum is the governing board for the State Museum. Replaces the Board of the Illinois State Museum with an advisory board. Describes the duties of the advisory board. Repeals a provision which states that the Department of Natural Resources may set, by administrative rule, an entrance fee for visitors to the Illinois State Museum. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE MUSEUM-ADMIN CHANGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mark L. Walker |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 801 | 1-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 801 | 20-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 801 | 20-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 801 | 20-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |