IL SB3238 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the exemption for coal and aggregate exploration, mining, off-highway hauling, processing, maintenance, and reclamation equipment sunsets on June 30, 2023 (currently, the exemption is subject to the Acts' automatic sunset provisions). Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TAX-COAL SUNSET
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] |
Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2019 |
2018-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 006-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |