IL SB3226 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, no later than 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the State Board of Education shall adopt rules as may be necessary to allow students of any high school in this State who are 16 years of age or older to participate in registered apprenticeship programs; defines "registered apprenticeship program". Provides that the rules shall include the waiver of all non-academic requirements mandated for graduation from a high school under the Code that would otherwise prohibit or prevent a student from participating in a registered apprenticeship program. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-REG APPRENTICE PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Weaver
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Weaver
2018-04-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.173New CodeSee Bill Text
105527-22.05Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback