IL SB3226 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, no later than 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the State Board of Education shall adopt rules as may be necessary to allow students of any high school in this State who are 16 years of age or older to participate in registered apprenticeship programs; defines "registered apprenticeship program". Provides that the rules shall include the waiver of all non-academic requirements mandated for graduation from a high school under the Code that would otherwise prohibit or prevent a student from participating in a registered apprenticeship program. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-REG APPRENTICE PROGRAM
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Weaver |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Weaver |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.173 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 27-22.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |