IL SB3225 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0960
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0960
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board shall conduct or approve a training program in veterans' awareness for law enforcement officers of local government agencies. Provides that the purpose of the program shall be to identify issues relating to veterans and to provide guidelines for appropriate responses to such issues.
Title
POLICE TRAINING ACT-VETERANS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0960 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee; 022-000-000 |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2014-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |