IL SB3220 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends an Article of the School Code concerning educator licensure. Provides that the State Board of Education shall not approve a course of study under the Alternative Educator Licensure Program for Teachers unless the State Board can demonstrate that there is a need for a particular type of licensed educator offered by the course of study.
Title
SCH CD-ALT TEACHER LICENSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 054-001-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 4 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 4 |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-008-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-001-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-003-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |