IL SB3214 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Joliet Arsenal Development Authority Act. Provides that the Board of the Joliet Arsenal Development Authority shall consist of 10 members (now, 9 members). Sets forth the membership of the Board. Provides that the County Executive of Will County, with the advice and consent of the Will County Board, shall appoint the additional member of the Board. Provides that the Authority shall be abolished upon the last to occur of the following: (i) expiration of the 25-year period (now, 15-year period) that began on the effective date of the Act; or (ii) one year after all revenue bonds, notes, and other evidences of indebtedness of the Authority have been fully paid and discharged or otherwise provided for. Effective immediately.
Title
JOLIET ARSENAL AUTHORITY-BOARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1122 | |
2010-07-20 | Effective Date July 20, 2010 | |
2010-07-20 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-22 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-002-000 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-20 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 015-001-000 | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-03-19 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross | |
2010-03-17 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-16 | First Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire | |
2010-03-16 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 044-001-000 | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Wilhelmi | |
2010-03-12 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-000-000 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |