IL SB3208 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-22 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-22 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that when a person sustains injury as a victim of a crime and is treated by a medical facility or a physician or nurse and the person presents himself or herself as a victim of a sex offense or domestic violence, the local law enforcement agency shall only be notified by the medical facility, or any physician or nurse that treats the victim, if the victim requests or agrees to the notification. Provides that this exception does not change the obligations of mandated reporters under the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Effective immediately.
Title
VICTIM-SEXUAL ASSAULT-NOTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 3.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3208&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB3208.htm |